Pripstein, Laura Pearl (CPSO#: 81273)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone: (647)730-3200
Fax: (416) 324-4181
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pripstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pripstein ( CPSO# 81273 )

Business Address:
45 Good Fellowship Road
Seguin ON  P2A 0B2
Phone Number: (705) 732-6964

Business Address:
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone Number: (416) 324-4100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA PEARL PRIPSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIPSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006