Pritchard, Mary Jane (CPSO#: 26985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leaside Health Centre
795 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4G 4E4
Phone: (416) 424-3145
Fax: (416) 424-2611
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

682 Warden Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1L 3Z9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY JANE PRITCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRITCHARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Nov 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1987