Profetto, Jason Raphael (CPSO#: 90630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
198 Barton Street East
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 2K2
Phone: (905) 662-9463
Fax: (905) 662-9464
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Profetto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Profetto ( CPSO# 90630 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
198 Barton Street East
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 2K2
Phone Number: (905) 662-9463

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON RAPHAEL PROFETTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROFETTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011