Prokopchuk-Gauk, Oksana Christa (CPSO#: 94709)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Jan 2011 to 04 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - Hematology

McMaster University, 05 Feb 2011 to 25 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Feb 2011