Prola, Ivo Roberto Dorneles (CPSO#: 94387)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidade de Santa Maria, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 18 Nov 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2010 to 25 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013