Prost, Eric William (CPSO#: 76174)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3522
Fax: (613) 544-9666
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC WILLIAM PROST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 25 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006