Proulx, Alain Arthur (CPSO#: 76179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6315
Fax: (519) 646-6193
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.A. Proulx Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Proulx ( CPSO# 76179 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6315

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAIN ARTHUR PROULX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROULX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006