Provias, John Peter (CPSO#: 52351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Nov 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
137 Barton Street East
Hamilton general Hospital
Hamilton ON  L8L 8A8
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 46167
Fax: (905) 524-2681
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 07 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PETER PROVIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROVIAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 1983 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Research Fellows - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1984