Prowse, Matthew Thomas Woodley (CPSO#: 89853)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 2010