Prowse, Owen Alexander (CPSO#: 68283)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Feb 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Centre Building
Suite 105
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 346-1440
Fax: (807) 346-1445
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Owen Prowse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Prowse ( CPSO# 68283 )

Business Address:
Medical Centre Building
Suite 105
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1440

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 27 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OWEN ALEXANDER PROWSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROWSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2002