Prychitko, Jonathan Terry Philip (CPSO#: 76194)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Ukrainian

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Prychitko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Prychitko ( CPSO# 76194 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 28 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN TERRY PHILIP PRYCHITKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRYCHITKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2010