Ptashny, Rachel (CPSO#: 93648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Youthdale Treatment Centre
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone: (416) 368-4896
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Ptashny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ptashny ( CPSO# 93648 )

Business Address:
Youthdale Treatment Centre
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone Number: (416) 368-4896

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL PTASHNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PTASHNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015