Puchalski Ritchie, Lisa Marie (CPSO#: 76536)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
RFE - G5-480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Knolwedge translation program
Li Ka Shing Knowledge Institute
St Michaels hospital
30 Bond St., Rm 716
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-6060
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
C/o Emergency Department
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5790
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Puchalski Ritchie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Puchalski Ritchie ( CPSO# 76536 )

Business Address:
Li Ka Shing Institute
716-30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
RFE-GS-480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA MARIE PUCHALSKI RITCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUCHALSKI RITCHIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2007