Puchyr, Martina (CPSO#: 83676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000 Ext. 21500
Fax: 416-242-1068
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martina Puchyr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Puchyr ( CPSO# 83676 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTINA PUCHYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUCHYR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2005 to 15 Sep 2005
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2008 to 17 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2010