Puddester, Derek Gordon (CPSO#: 69146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mental Health Patient Service Unit
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2703
Fax: (613) 738-4202
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Canadian Forces Health Services Cen
PO Box 17000 Stn Forces
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Canada
Phone: 6135415010 Ext. 6310
Fax: 6135414607
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.G.Puddester Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Puddester ( CPSO# 69146 )

Business Address:
451 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone Number: (613) 562-5800

Business Address:
Mental Health Patient Service Unit
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
150 Bloor Street West
Suite 900
Toronto ON  M5S 3C1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK GORDON PUDDESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUDDESTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2000