Pulcine, Elizabeth (CPSO#: 97904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2018

Summary

Former Name: Kouzmitcheva, Elizabeth (used until: 27 Jan 2019 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5320
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH PULCINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PULCINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2018