Puley, Geoffrey Scott (CPSO#: 71367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ONE HEART CARE - 2nd Floor
1000 Middlegate Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1M4
Phone: (905) 615-9285
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoff Puley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Puley ( CPSO# 71367 )

Business Address:
1000 Middlegate Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 0G1
Phone Number: (905) 804-7000

Business Address:
Suite 206
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 615-9285

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY SCOTT PULEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PULEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001