Punja, Alim Mansoorali (CPSO#: 86484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alim Punja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIM MANSOORALI PUNJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUNJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 21 Aug 2012 to 17 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012