Punjani, Yasmeen Ali Bhai (CPSO#: 73812)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8111
Fax: (416) 289-2961
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Warden woods medical centre
99-firvalley ct
Scarborough ON  M1L1P2
Canada
Phone: 416-694-7400
Fax: 416-694-7401
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

East GTA Family Health team
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Canada
Phone: 416-284-6168
Fax: 416-673-0369
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2683 Lawrence ave east
Dox Medical clinic
Scarborough ON  M1P 2S2
Canada
Phone: 416-299-0710
Fax: 416-299-1653
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2680 Lawrence ave east
unit 111
Scarborough Health centre
Scarborough ON  M1P 4Y4
Canada
Phone: 416-755-2241
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Punjani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Punjani ( CPSO# 73812 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASMEEN ALI BHAI PUNJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUNJANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2003