Purdy, Jennifer Lynn (CPSO#: 89538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
591 March Rd Unit 9
Ottawa ON  K2K 2M5
Phone: (613)271-1103
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.L. Purdy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Purdy ( CPSO# 89538 )

Business Address:
9 - 591 March Road
Ottawa ON  K2K 2M5
Phone Number: (613) 271-1103

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNN PURDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010