Purgina, Bibianna Maria (CPSO#: 82574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Anatomical Pathology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 72082
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bibianna Purgina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Purgina ( CPSO# 82574 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Anatomical Pathology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIBIANNA MARIA PURGINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURGINA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2012