Purkey, Eva Nancy-Marie (CPSO#: 79637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Bagot street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9300
Fax: (613) 533-2210
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVA NANCY-MARIE PURKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURKEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2005