Purzner, Andrew Anthony (CPSO#: 91722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elliot Lake Family Health Team
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y9
Phone: (705) 461-8882
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Anthony Purzner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Purzner ( CPSO# 91722 )

Business Address:
Elliot Lake Family Health Team
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1Y6
Phone Number: (705) 461-8882

Business Address:
ST Joseph General Hospital
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Phone Number: (705) 848-7182

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW ANTHONY PURZNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURZNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009