Purzner, James Gustav (CPSO#: 91517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
339 Bathurst Street WW 4 450
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5503
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES GUSTAV PURZNER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PURZNER is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. PURZNER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PURZNER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PURZNER shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PURZNER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PURZNER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019