Pylypiak, Daria Christina (CPSO#: 93169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Infinity Health Centre
39 Lower Simcoe Street
Toronto ON  M5J 3A6
Phone: (416) 504-0628
Fax: (416) 504-2009
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Pylypiak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pylypiak ( CPSO# 93169 )

Business Address:
Infinity Health Centre
39 Lower Simcoe Street
Toronto ON  M5J 3A6
Phone Number: (416) 504-0628

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARIA CHRISTINA PYLYPIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYLYPIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012