Qadeer, Shehla (CPSO#: 84948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitby Medical Arts Centre
Suite 203
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone: (905) 404-9666
Fax: (905) 404-9135
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shehla Qadeer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Qadeer ( CPSO# 84948 )

Business Address:
Whitby Medical Arts Centre
Suite 203
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 404-9666

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEHLA QADEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QADEER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008