Qari, Fayza Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 79790)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2003