Qashqary, Sami Ahmed (CPSO#: 73765)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2011
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sami Ahmed Qashqary to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 17, 2016:

Dr. Qashqary was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his emergency medicine practice.

In the face of these allegations, Dr. Qashqary resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction in Canada.
Download Full Document (PDF)