Qi, Victoria Zhi (CPSO#: 79674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
465 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2B2
Phone: (416) 364-2261
Fax: (416) 364-0822
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTORIA ZHI QI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005