Qirjazi, Elena (CPSO#: 95718)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
E6 - 102
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 663-3511
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elena Qirjazi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Qirjazi ( CPSO# 95718 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Medicine
Room E6-102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Road
London ON  N6A 4V2

Business Address:
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3E2

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3

Business Address:
911 Queen`s Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA QIRJAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QIRJAZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Oct 2018
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015