Quan, May Lynn (CPSO#: 73358)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 May 1999 to 25 Jun 1999
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2010