Quateen, Aiman Salem (CPSO#: 99016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7777
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 12 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AIMAN SALEM QUATEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUATEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2018