Quereshy, Fayez Ahmad (CPSO#: 81296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Umiversity Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
Main Pavillion 8 - 320
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5553
Fax: (416) 603-5714
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fayez A. Quereshy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Quereshy ( CPSO# 81296 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
Main Pavillion 8-320
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5553

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAYEZ AHMAD QUERESHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUERESHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010