Quinlan, Andrew James (CPSO#: 108679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Gastroenterology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES QUINLAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. QUINLAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. QUINLAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. QUINLAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. QUINLAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. QUINLAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. QUINLAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Apr 2016 to 06 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2017 to 27 Aug 2017
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018