Quinn, Dana Lynn (CPSO#: 74764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 2004

Summary

Former Name: McKay, Dana Lynn (used until: 07 Sep 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Waterloo
Student Health Services
200 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3G1
Phone: (519) 888-4096
Fax: (519) 746-5023
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Region of Waterloo Public Health
2nd Floor
99 Regina Street
Waterloo ON  N2J 3A8
Canada
Phone: (519) 883-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Oct 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANA LYNN QUINN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUINN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Apr 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 May 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2004