Quinn, Leo Peter (CPSO#: 21368)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Quinn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2012


Corporation Name: Leo Quinn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Glazier Medical Centre 11 Gib St Oshawa, ON L1H 2J9
Date Received: 03 Jul 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2018