Quirt, Jaclyn Ann (CPSO#: 92784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Medicine
HSC 3V50 - 1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73928
Fax: (905) 521-4971
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 - 470 Hensall Cir
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V4
Canada
Phone: (905) 566-0555
Fax: (905) 566-5294
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jaclyn Quirt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Quirt ( CPSO# 92784 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Medicine
HSC3W11
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Suite 100
470 Hensall Circle
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V4
Phone Number: (905) 566-0555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 03 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACLYN ANN QUIRT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUIRT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2015