Quirt, Kate Correll (CPSO#: 95655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.C. Quirt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Quirt ( CPSO# 95655 )

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATE CORRELL QUIRT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUIRT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2015 to 05 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2013