Qureshi, Omar (CPSO#: 94409)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-3490
Fax: (905) 721-6699
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Qureshi ( CPSO# 94409 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
2nd Floor
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-3490

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Jul 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Omar Qureshi may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine, only.