Qureshi, Roohi Yasmin (CPSO#: 74095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Corporate Health & Safety Services
30 Bond Street
2nd Floor Shuter Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5013
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.Y. Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Qureshi ( CPSO# 74095 )
Dr. A. Qureshi ( CPSO# 25468 )

Business Address:
St. Michaels Hospital
2nd Floor Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5013

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4175

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROOHI YASMIN QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004