Qureshi, Salman Tahir (CPSO#: 66303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALMAN TAHIR QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 May 1993 to 28 May 1993
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1996