Qureshi, Sameer (CPSO#: 85814)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 11 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 23 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Mar 2008 to 23 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Mar 2009 to 19 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010