Qureshi, Shahzad (CPSO#: 89731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Enhanced Care Clinic
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Canada
Phone: (905) 505-0950
Fax: (905) 841-8978
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shahzad Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Qureshi ( CPSO# 89731 )

Business Address:
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone Number: (905) 505-0950

Business Address:
21-117 Yonge Street
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Phone Number: (705) 434-5338

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHZAD QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)