Qureshy, Kamran Saleem (CPSO#: 73200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Urdu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone: (905) 553-4232
Fax: (905) 553-6232
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

102 - 200 Ronson Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9W 5Z9
Canada
Phone: (416) 240-7608
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

2291 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9W 4L6
Canada
Phone: (416) 741-2798
Fax: (905) 553-6232
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Qureshy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Qureshy ( CPSO# 73200 )

Business Address:
1 - 2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 832-3838

Business Address:
2291 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9W 4L6
Phone Number: (416) 741-2798

Business Address:
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 592-2303

Business Address:
102 - 200 Ronson Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9W 5Z9
Phone Number: (416) 240-7608

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMRAN SALEEM QURESHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 28 Feb 1999
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2002