Qutob, Majdi Shaker (CPSO#: 85077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Qutob Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Qutob ( CPSO# 85077 )
Dr. E. Alvarez ( CPSO# 85941 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
CRL 2nd Floor
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 515-8401

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAJDI SHAKER QUTOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUTOB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 26 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 27 Jul 2007 to 26 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 27 Jul 2008 to 26 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 27 Jul 2009 to 26 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 27 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011