Quttainah, Adel Esmat Shahada (CPSO#: 71801)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 11 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004