Qutub, Mohammed Ahmed Hasan (CPSO#: 86049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
King AbdulAziz University Hospital
po box 80215
Jeddah 21589
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966126401000 Ext. 18272

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED AHMED HASAN QUTUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUTUB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Apr 2007 to 25 Jun 2007
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2010 to 02 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2011 to 02 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2012