First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2001 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jun 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Dec 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Feb 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2011 |