Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: September 15, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ramsarran Maraj to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 15, 2021:
Following a report that raised concerns about Dr. Maraj’s standard of practice in family medicine, he underwent remediation and a reassessment. The reassessment report received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in family medicine. As a result of the reassessment:
Dr. Maraj will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College until March 31, 2022, except while practicing as a surgical assistant with a surgeon.
Effective March 31, 2022, Dr. Maraj’s practice will be restricted only to a surgical assistant.
Dr. Maraj will engage in professional education including in medical record keeping, prescribing and with respect to several clinical guidelines and tools
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: January 15, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 12, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective March 26, 2019, Dr. Maraj has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)