Naidu, Renuka Srinivasan (CPSO#: 86672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Nagpur University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4506
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge
ON
Cambridge ON  N1R3G2
Canada
Phone: 5196212330 Ext. 2155
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

800 Commissioners Rd East
London
ON
London ON  N6A5W9
Canada
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 13526
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Renuka Naidu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Naidu ( CPSO# 86672 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENUKA SRINIVASAN NAIDU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIDU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2011